IA HSB20 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF140
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF140.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF140.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county commissions of veteran affairs training and making an appropriation.(See HF 140.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to county commissions of veteran affairs training and making an appropriation.(See HF 140.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF140. |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 191. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 3:00PM RM 19. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, Stoltenberg and Wilburn. H.J. 96. |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 93. |
2023-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
HF140 (Replaced by) 2023-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB20 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB20.html |