IA HSB187 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF523
Note: Legislation replaced by HF629
Note: Legislation replaced by HF629
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Agriculture.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Agriculture.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for exempting the sale of honey bees from the imposition of the sales tax and use tax.
Title
A study bill for exempting the sale of honey bees from the imposition of the sales tax and use tax.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Voted - Agriculture. |
2015-03-03 | House | 12:00PM; House Lounge Agriculture. |
2015-03-02 | House | 12:00PM; House Lounge Agriculture. |
2015-03-02 | House | Agriculture: Moore Chair,Drake, and Miller. |
2015-02-26 | House | In Agriculture |
2015-02-26 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF523 (Replaced by) 2015-03-25 - Passed subcommittee.
HF629 (Replaced by) 2015-06-04 - Referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 1135.
HF629 (Replaced by) 2015-06-04 - Referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 1135.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB187 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB187.html |