IA HSB175 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF417
Note: Legislation replaced by HF475
Note: Legislation replaced by HF475
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 475.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 475.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to unfair residential real estate service agreements, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 475.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to unfair residential real estate service agreements, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 475.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 475. |
2023-02-23 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419. |
2023-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 11:45AM House Lounge. |
2023-02-20 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Judge and Thompson, P. H.J. 374. |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 373. |
2023-02-20 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1156 (Related) 2023-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 417.
SF417 (Replaced by) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 884.
HF475 (Replaced by) 2023-05-12 - Fiscal note.
SF417 (Replaced by) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 884.
HF475 (Replaced by) 2023-05-12 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB175 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB175.html |