IA HSB16 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Economic Growth and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Economic Growth and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the definitions of essential county purpose and essential corporate purpose to include cybersecurity purposes.
Title
A bill for an act modifying the definitions of essential county purpose and essential corporate purpose to include cybersecurity purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2023 4:30PM RM 304.1. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Latham, Graber and Isenhart. H.J. 96. |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 93. |
2023-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB16 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB16.html |