IA HSB158 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 432.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 432.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to access to unit owners associations' financial information and meeting minutes.(See HF 432.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to access to unit owners associations' financial information and meeting minutes.(See HF 432.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 432. |
2023-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 384. |
2023-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2023 12:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Judge and Vondran. H.J. 307. |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 307. |
2023-02-14 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF44 (Replaced by) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 518. S.J. 498.
HF432 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1040.
SF518 (Replaced by) 2023-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 956.
HF432 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1040.
SF518 (Replaced by) 2023-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 956.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB158 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB158.html |