IA HSB147 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF642
Note: Legislation replaced by SF574
Note: Legislation replaced by SF574
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 642.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 642.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the major economic growth attraction program to be administered by the economic development authority, and providing penalties.(See HF 642.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the major economic growth attraction program to be administered by the economic development authority, and providing penalties.(See HF 642.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 642. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 496. |
2023-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2023-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2023 7:45AM House Lounge 2 (Cancelled). |
2023-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Gerhold and Staed. H.J. 262. |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 259. |
2023-02-07 | House | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1162 (Related) 2023-04-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 574.
HF642 (Replaced by) 2023-03-30 - Fiscal note.
SF574 (Replaced by) 2024-05-10 - Correction approved. S.J. 962.
HF642 (Replaced by) 2023-03-30 - Fiscal note.
SF574 (Replaced by) 2024-05-10 - Correction approved. S.J. 962.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB147 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB147.html |