IA HSB144 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF202
Note: Legislation replaced by HF350
Note: Legislation replaced by HF350
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 350.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 350.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public records requests.(See HF 350.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to public records requests.(See HF 350.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 350. |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 361. |
2023-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-02-08 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Golding, Bossman and Gjerde. H.J. 275. |
2023-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2023 8:10AM RM 304.1. |
2023-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Golding, Gjerde and Sexton. H.J. 261. |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 259. |
2023-02-07 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1036 (Related) 2023-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 202.
SF202 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091.
HF350 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091.
SF202 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091.
HF350 (Replaced by) 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1091.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB144 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB144.html |