IA HSB118 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF409
Note: Legislation replaced by HF525
Note: Legislation replaced by HF525
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 453.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 453.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state credit union examinations and board meetings called by the superintendent of credit unions, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state credit union examinations and board meetings called by the superintendent of credit unions, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 453. |
2017-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 8:00AM House Lounge |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Landon, Bloomingdale and Kressig. H.J. 318. |
2017-02-15 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1098 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF409 (Replaced by) 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 761.
HF525 (Replaced by) 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.
SF409 (Replaced by) 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 761.
HF525 (Replaced by) 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB118 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB118.html |