IA HSB117 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF171
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 171.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 171.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to school funding by establishing the state percent of growth and the categorical state percent of growth for the budget year beginning July 1, 2023, modifying provisions relating to the property tax replacement payments, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 171.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to school funding by establishing the state percent of growth and the categorical state percent of growth for the budget year beginning July 1, 2023, modifying provisions relating to the property tax replacement payments, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 171.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 171. |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 230. |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-2. |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 11:30AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Johnson, Ehlert, Fry, Gehlbach and Steckman. H.J. 208. |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 206. |
2023-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HF171 (Replaced by) 2023-02-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 255.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB117 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB117.html |