IA HSB110 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF564
Note: Legislation replaced by SF511
Note: Legislation replaced by SF511
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 564.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 564.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to child in need of assistance proceedings concerning determinations of reasonable efforts for placement of a child and access to criminal history data.(See HF 564.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to child in need of assistance proceedings concerning determinations of reasonable efforts for placement of a child and access to criminal history data.(See HF 564.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 564. |
2023-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 471. |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2023 8:00AM House Lounge 2. |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Collins and James. H.J. 208. |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 205. |
2023-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1112 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 511.
HF564 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1041.
SF511 (Replaced by) 2023-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 969.
HF564 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1041.
SF511 (Replaced by) 2023-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 969.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB110 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB110.html |