IA SSB1112 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF564
Note: Legislation replaced by SF511

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 511.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to child in need of assistance proceedings concerning determinations of reasonable efforts for placement of a child and access to criminal history data.(See SF 511.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to child in need of assistance proceedings concerning determinations of reasonable efforts for placement of a child and access to criminal history data.(See SF 511.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 511.
2023-02-08SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-02-06SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2023 12:30PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-01-31SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, De Witt, and Weiner.
2023-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2023-01-31SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB110 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 564.
HF564 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1041.
SF511 (Replaced by) 2023-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 969.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback