IA HR109 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-11)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Resolution adopted. H.J. 467.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Resolution adopted. H.J. 467.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution recognizing February 10, 2014, as the 60th anniversary of the introduction of federal legislation to add the words, "under God," to the United States Pledge of Allegiance.
Title
A resolution recognizing February 10, 2014, as the 60th anniversary of the introduction of federal legislation to add the words, "under God," to the United States Pledge of Allegiance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Resolution adopted. H.J. 467. |
2014-03-03 | House | Sponsor added, Gaskill. H.J. 377. |
2014-02-27 | House | Resolution filed, laid over under Rule 25. H.J. 371. |