IA HJR11 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the rights of a crime victim.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the rights of a crime victim.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 3:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-25 | House | Subcommittee: Hinson, Hite and Wolfe. H.J. 352. |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 335. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1215 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee: Chapman, Sweeney, and Bisignano.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HJR11 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HJR11.html |