IA HF860 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection. Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection. Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall amendment H–1447 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Shall amendment H–1447 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2021-06-02 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1207. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1092. |
2021-05-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1151. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1206. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1205. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1200. |
2021-05-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 54, nays 36. H.J. 1147. |
2021-05-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1499. H.J. 1147. |
2021-05-17 | House | Senate amendment H-1499 filed. H.J. 1140. |
2021-05-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1118. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1074. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 28, nays 17. S.J. 1073. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3206 filed, adopted. S.J. 1073. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Substituted for SF 598. S.J. 1073. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 598. S.J. 1046. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1046. |
2021-05-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1076. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1174. |
2021-05-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1100. |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed House, yeas 54, nays 36. H.J. 1054. |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1419 withdrawn. H.J. 1053. |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1395 adopted. H.J. 1053. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1174. |
2021-05-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1100. |
2021-05-07 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1447 filed, lost. H.J. 1053. |
2021-05-06 | House | Amendment H-1394 adopted. H.J. 1052. |
2021-04-27 | House | Amendment H-1419 filed. H.J. 1020. |
2021-04-14 | House | Amendment H-1395 filed. H.J. 963. |
2021-04-13 | House | Amendment H-1394 filed. H.J. 952. |
2021-04-07 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2021-04-07 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 900. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1261 (Related) 2021-04-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 598.
SF598 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1074.
SF598 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1074.