IA HF81 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 567.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 567.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the reduction of damages payable to an unresponsive property owner in condemnation proceedings and including applicability provisions.(See HF 804, HF 2442.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the reduction of damages payable to an unresponsive property owner in condemnation proceedings and including applicability provisions.(See HF 804, HF 2442.)
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Lohse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 567. |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 804. |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 612. |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Lohse, Mitchell and Oldson. H.J. 222. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 1:00PM House Lounge 1. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Mitchell and Wolfe. H.J. 118. |
2021-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 110. |
Same As/Similar To
HF804 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 567.
HF2442 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 513.
HF2442 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 513.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF81 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF81.html |