IA HF81 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Failed committee passage, in Natural Resources. H.J. 347.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Failed committee passage, in Natural Resources. H.J. 347.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to stocking of waters located on private property.
Title
A bill for an act relating to stocking of waters located on private property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Failed committee passage, in Natural Resources. H.J. 347. |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 3:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Fisher, Hall and Thorup. H.J. 185. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 139. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1019 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF81 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF81.html |