IA HF769 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the gross weight of special trucks, and providing fees. (Formerly HF 483 and HF 75.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the gross weight of special trucks, and providing fees. (Formerly HF 483 and HF 75.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1046. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1151. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1150. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for SF 637. S.J. 1150. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 637. S.J. 1137. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1137. |
2019-04-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1036. |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 99 nays none. H.J. 1017. |
2019-04-10 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 754. |
Same As/Similar To
SF83 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 187. S.J. 237.
HF75 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
SF187 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 637. S.J. 1074.
HF483 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
SF637 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1151.
HF75 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
SF187 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 637. S.J. 1074.
HF483 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
SF637 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1151.