IA HF483 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the gross weight of special trucks, and providing fees. (Formerly HF 75; See HF 769.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the gross weight of special trucks, and providing fees. (Formerly HF 75; See HF 769.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1042. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 759. |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2019 10:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-20 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Kurtz and Sieck. H.J. 600. |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 338. |
Same As/Similar To
SF83 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 187. S.J. 237.
HF75 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
SF187 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 637. S.J. 1074.
HF769 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
SF637 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1151.
HF75 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1042.
SF187 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 637. S.J. 1074.
HF769 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
SF637 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1151.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF483 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF483.html |