IA HF746 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Subcommittee: Hagenow, Hein and Jacoby. H.J. 161.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Subcommittee: Hagenow, Hein and Jacoby. H.J. 161.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adult adoptee or an entitled person, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 528 and HF 53.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adult adoptee or an entitled person, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 528 and HF 53.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Hagenow, Hein and Jacoby. H.J. 161. |
2019-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-22 | House | Amendment H-1266 filed. H.J. 947. |
2019-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1253 filed. H.J. 926. |
2019-04-11 | House | Amendments H-1203 and H-1205 filed. H.J. 844. |
2019-04-10 | House | Amendment H-1200 filed. H.J. 811. |
2019-03-20 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 590. |
Same As/Similar To
HF53 (Similar To) 2019-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 315.
HF528 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 586.
HF528 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 586.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF746 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF746.html |