IA HF737 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Bisignano, and Cournoyer. S.J. 640.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Bisignano, and Cournoyer. S.J. 640.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the placement of dental sealants on teeth by a dental assistant.(Formerly HF 516.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the placement of dental sealants on teeth by a dental assistant.(Formerly HF 516.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Bisignano, and Cournoyer. S.J. 640. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 575. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 575. |
2021-03-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 679. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 698. |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 91, nays 2. H.J. 675. |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 590. |
Same As/Similar To
HF516 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.