IA HF516 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the placement of dental sealants on teeth by a dental assistant.(See HF 737.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the placement of dental sealants on teeth by a dental assistant.(See HF 737.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 679.
2021-03-03HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 737.
2021-03-02HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 568.
2021-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
2021-02-16HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 12:30PM RM 15.
2021-02-15HouseSubcommittee: Bradley, Jeneary and Sunde. H.J. 394.
2021-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 390.

Same As/Similar To

HF737 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Bisignano, and Cournoyer. S.J. 640.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback