IA HF737 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the regulation of persons involved with animals other than livestock and certain wild animals, providing for criminal offenses and court orders associated with animal mistreatment, and including penalties. (Formerly HSB 114.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the regulation of persons involved with animals other than livestock and certain wild animals, providing for criminal offenses and court orders associated with animal mistreatment, and including penalties. (Formerly HSB 114.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 789.
2020-06-29HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 789.
2020-06-24HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788.
2020-06-24HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788.
2020-06-13HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 755.
2020-06-13SenateImmediate message. S.J. 823.
2020-06-13SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 861.
2020-06-13SenatePassed Senate, yeas 44, nays 4. S.J. 823.
2020-06-13SenateSenate concurred with S-5148. S.J. 823.
2020-06-12SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-5148. S.J. 793.
2020-06-12HouseImmediate message. H.J. 722.
2020-06-12HousePassed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 721.
2020-06-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-8084 as amended. H.J. 720.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8277, to Senate amendment H-8084 adopted. H.J. 720.
2020-06-11HouseAmendment H-8277 filed. H.J. 711.
2020-03-10HouseFiscal note.
2020-03-04HouseSenate amendment H-8084 filed
2020-03-04HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 485.
2020-03-04SenateImmediate message. S.J. 525.
2020-03-04SenatePassed Senate, yeas 44, nays 3. S.J. 525.
2020-03-04SenateAmendment S-5059 adopted, as amended. S.J. 525.
2020-03-04SenateAmendment S-5066 to S-5059 filed, adopted. S.J. 524.
2020-03-04SenateAmendment S-5059 filed. S.J. 524.
2020-03-04SenateAmendment S-5062 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 524.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 931.
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 862.
2019-04-01SenateSubcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 814.
2019-03-28SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 794.
2019-03-28SenateMessage from House. S.J. 794.
2019-03-28HouseImmediate message. H.J. 688.
2019-04-26HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1055.
2019-03-28HousePassed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 687.
2019-03-26HouseFiscal note.
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 538.

Same As/Similar To

HSB114 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback