IA HF727 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 119.
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 119.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to safe walkways for railroad workers and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HF 222)
Title
A bill for an act relating to safe walkways for railroad workers and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HF 222)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 119. | |
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Labor. H.J. 1447. | |
2009-03-13 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 798. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0778C&ga=83 |