IA HF706 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to replacement of the term visitation with the term parenting time relative to time awarded to a parent. (Formerly HF 583; See HF 2366.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to replacement of the term visitation with the term parenting time relative to time awarded to a parent. (Formerly HF 583; See HF 2366.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 393. |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 234. |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 10:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, Gustafson and Meyer, B. H.J. 80. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 755. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 482. |
Same As/Similar To
HF583 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 393.
HF2366 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 544.
HF2366 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 544.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF706 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF706.html |