IA HF2366 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 544.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 544.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to replacement of the term visitation with the term parenting time relative to time awarded to a parent. (Formerly HF 706, HF 583.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to replacement of the term visitation with the term parenting time relative to time awarded to a parent. (Formerly HF 706, HF 583.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 544. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2020 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Hogg, and Sweeney. S.J. 483. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 444. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 444. |
2020-02-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 393. |
2020-03-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 443. |
2020-02-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 405. |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays none. H.J. 386. |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 259. |
Same As/Similar To
HF583 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 393.
HF706 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 393.
HF706 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 393.