IA HF694 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing an emergency medical services personnel licensure interstate compact. (Formerly HSB 192.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act establishing an emergency medical services personnel licensure interstate compact. (Formerly HSB 192.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1037. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1132. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 1131. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 931. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 850. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Giddens, and Miller-Meeks. S.J. 751. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 715. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 715. |
2019-03-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 616. |
2019-03-25 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 622. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 609. |
2019-03-21 | House | Amendment H-1065 adopted. H.J. 608. |
2019-03-20 | House | Amendment H-1065 filed. H.J. 601. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 481. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB192 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 422.