IA HF693 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the utilities division of the department of commerce. (Formerly HF 483, HSB 137.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the utilities division of the department of commerce. (Formerly HF 483, HSB 137.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038. |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1037. |
2021-04-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 940. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 869. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 868. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 737. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Dickey, and Petersen. S.J. 677. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 603. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 550. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 550. |
2021-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 630. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 697. |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 621. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 539. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB137 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 483.
SSB1128 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 347.
HF483 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
SF347 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SSB1128 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 347.
HF483 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
SF347 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.