IA HF670 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a butchery innovation and revitalization fund and program to be administered by the economic development authority and creating a task force to explore the feasibility of establishing a community college artisanal butchery program.(See HF 787, HF 857.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a butchery innovation and revitalization fund and program to be administered by the economic development authority and creating a task force to explore the feasibility of establishing a community college artisanal butchery program.(See HF 787, HF 857.)
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Ingels [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 950. |
2021-03-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 787. |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 599. |
2021-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-03-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2021-02-27 | House | Subcommittee: Ingels, Staed and Thompson. H.J. 562. |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth. H.J. 506. |
Same As/Similar To
HF787 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
HF857 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211.
HF857 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1211.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF670 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF670.html |