IA HF662 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1188.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1188.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to vital statistics, including access to birth records and vital statistics fees collected by the state and county registrars of vital statistics. Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to vital statistics, including access to birth records and vital statistics fees collected by the state and county registrars of vital statistics. Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1188. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1119. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1062. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 1061. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1034. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Subcommittee, Allen, Quirmbach, and Smith. S.J. 1017. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 985. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 985. |
2015-05-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1025. |
2015-06-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1132. |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 79, nays 19. H.J. 1020. |
2015-04-29 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 938. |