IA HF657 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to abortions including prohibiting late-term abortions with certain exceptions, providing penalties, and including an effective date provision. (Formerly HF 5)
Title
A bill for an act relating to abortions including prohibiting late-term abortions with certain exceptions, providing penalties, and including an effective date provision. (Formerly HF 5)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-05-11 | Amendment S-3332 filed. S.J. 1111. | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on calendar under Rule 42. S.J. 1100. | |
2011-04-13 | Subcommittee, Courtney, Greiner, and Sodders. S.J. 992. | |
2011-04-05 | Referred to Government Oversight. S.J. 906. | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 857. | |
2011-04-04 | Message from House. S.J. 857. | |
2011-03-31 | Immediate message. H.J. 867. | |
2011-03-31 | Passed House, ayes 60, nays 39. H.J. 866. | |
2011-03-24 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 800. |