IA HF651 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 1191.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 1191.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to expenditures of moneys from the E911 emergency communications fund, other duties of the department of homeland security and emergency management, and other properly related matters. Item vetoed 7-2-15. Effective 7-2-15, with exception of section 1, s.s. 1 and 2; sections 2 and 4.
Title
A bill for an act relating to expenditures of moneys from the E911 emergency communications fund, other duties of the department of homeland security and emergency management, and other properly related matters. Item vetoed 7-2-15. Effective 7-2-15, with exception of section 1, s.s. 1 and 2; sections 2 and 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 1191. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 0. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 0. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1109. |
2015-06-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1166. |
2015-06-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 92, nays none. H.J. 1165. |
2015-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1394. H.J. 1165. |
2015-06-04 | House | Senate amendment H-1394 filed. H.J. 1152. |
2015-06-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1149. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1102. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 41, nays 9. S.J. 1098. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3226 adopted. S.J. 1098. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-3226 filed. S.J. 1097. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 1097. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dvorsky, Chapman, Courtney, Danielson, and Garrett. S.J. 995. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 979. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 979. |
2015-05-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1013. |
2015-06-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1132. |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 987. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1328B adopted. H.J. 987. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1328A lost. H.J. 986. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1328 filed. H.J. 985. |
2015-05-05 | House | Amendment H-1312 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 985. |
2015-04-30 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-04-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 920. |