IA HF643 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 1154.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund, the state bond repayment fund, the technology reinvestment fund, and the revenue bonds capitals fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 204.) Item vetoed. Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 12 and 14 effective 5-12-17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund, the state bond repayment fund, the technology reinvestment fund, and the revenue bonds capitals fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 204.) Item vetoed. Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 12 and 14 effective 5-12-17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseItem vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 1154.
2017-05-03HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 1147.
2017-05-03HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147.
2017-04-19HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1094.
2017-04-19SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1081.
2017-04-19SenatePassed Senate, ayes 42, nays 8. S.J. 1075.
2017-04-19SenateSubstituted for SF 514. S.J. 1074.
2017-04-19SenateRead first time and attached to similar SF 514. S.J. 1064.
2017-04-19SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1064.
2017-04-18HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1053.
2017-04-18HousePassed House, ayes 58, nays 40. H.J. 1053.
2017-04-18HouseSponsor added, H-1391: Staed. H.J. 1074.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1391 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1052.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1379 filed, adopted. H.J. 1052.
2017-04-18HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1052.
2017-04-18HouseMotion to suspend rules to consider H-1378. H.J. 1051.
2017-04-18HousePoint of order raised on H-1378, ruled not germane. H.J. 1051.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1378 filed. H.J. 1051.
2017-04-18HouseSponsors added, H-1377: Bennett, Kressig, Miller, Nielsen, R. Smith, Staed, Steckman and T. Taylor. H.J. 1074.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1377 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1051.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1388 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1051.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1387 filed, adopted. H.J. 1051.
2017-04-18HouseSpeaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 1051.
2017-04-18HousePoint of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 1051.
2017-04-18HouseAsked and received unanimous consent for immdediate consideration. H.J. 1050.
2017-04-14HouseIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 1014.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback