IA HSB204 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF643
Note: Legislation replaced by SF514
Note: Legislation replaced by SF514
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-14 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-14 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund, the state bond repayment fund, the technology reinvestment fund, and the revenue bonds capitals fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund, the state bond repayment fund, the technology reinvestment fund, and the revenue bonds capitals fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1016. |
2017-04-13 | House | NOBA: House Sub |
2017-04-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION, INFRASTRUCTURE, AND CAPITALS APPROPRIATIONS SUBCOMMITTEE |
Same As/Similar To
HF643 (Replaced by) 2017-05-12 - NOBA: Graybook
SF514 (Replaced by) 2017-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1076.
SSB1197 (Related) 2017-04-17 - NOBA: Senate Sub
SF514 (Replaced by) 2017-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1076.
SSB1197 (Related) 2017-04-17 - NOBA: Senate Sub
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB204 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB204.html |