IA HF625 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to direct health care agreements, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 289; See HF 2200.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to direct health care agreements, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly HF 289; See HF 2200.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 489. |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2200. |
2022-01-27 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 145. |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 12:00PM RM 19. |
2022-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Bush, Anderson and Fry. H.J. 88. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 965. |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 496. |
Same As/Similar To
HF289 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
HF2200 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 874.
HF2200 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 874.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF625 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF625.html |