IA HF2200 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 874.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 874.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to direct health care agreements, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 625, HF 289.) Effective date: 05/12/2022. Applicability date: 05/12/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to direct health care agreements, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 625, HF 289.) Effective date: 05/12/2022. Applicability date: 05/12/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 874. |
2022-05-12 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 874. |
2022-03-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 604. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 584. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16. S.J. 583. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2276. S.J. 583. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 552. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 2276. S.J. 437. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 437. |
2022-03-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 456. |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 90, nays 9. H.J. 455. |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment H-8104 adopted. H.J. 455. |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment H-8104 filed. H.J. 441. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 156. |
Same As/Similar To
HF289 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
HF625 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
HF625 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.