IA HF620 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of certain subdivided real property and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 509 & HSB 103.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of certain subdivided real property and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 509 & HSB 103.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20. |
2017-04-04 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 818. |
2017-02-28 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 811. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB103 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 471.
SSB1116 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF375 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - Fiscal note.
HF509 (Similar To) 2017-03-21 - Fiscal note.
SSB1116 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF375 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - Fiscal note.
HF509 (Similar To) 2017-03-21 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF620 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF620.html |