IA HF619 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2019 2:00PM House Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2019 2:00PM House Lounge.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the notification of law enforcement regarding the discharge of a voluntary patient who is mentally ill or has symptoms of mental illness from a hospital. (See HF 722.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the notification of law enforcement regarding the discharge of a voluntary patient who is mentally ill or has symptoms of mental illness from a hospital. (See HF 722.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2019 2:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 466. |
2019-03-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, James and Osmundson. H.J. 417. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rereferred to Human Resources. H.J. 416. |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/07/2019 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 397. |
Same As/Similar To
HF722 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 755.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF619 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF619.html |