IA HF603 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1187.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1187.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting from the sales tax the sales price for the use of self-pay washers and dryers. Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act exempting from the sales tax the sales price for the use of self-pay washers and dryers. Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Passed House (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - Passed House (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1187. |
2015-06-11 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1128. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1077. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 1074. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1073. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Allen, et al. S.J. 1067. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 1051. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1051. |
2015-06-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1117. |
2015-06-02 | House | Passed House, ayes 76, nays 14. H.J. 1112. |
2015-03-25 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 659. |