IA HF600 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the electronic publication of certain public notices by governmental bodies and officers and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act requiring the electronic publication of certain public notices by governmental bodies and officers and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | House | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2021-02-26 | House | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. |
2021-02-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 8:30AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-02-23 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Donahue and Siegrist. H.J. 548. |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 483. |
Same As/Similar To
SF228 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Subcommittee: Klimesh, Guth, and Hogg. S.J. 252.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF600 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF600.html |