IA HF6 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a child care workforce state matching grants program and fund administered by the early childhood Iowa state board to award matching state grants to eligible communities and making an appropriation.(See HF 301.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a child care workforce state matching grants program and fund administered by the early childhood Iowa state board to award matching state grants to eligible communities and making an appropriation.(See HF 301.)
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Meyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 368. |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 301. |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 224. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/13/2021 4:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Andrews and Ehlert. H.J. 70. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 40. |
Same As/Similar To
HF301 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF6 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF6.html |