IA HF301 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act establishing a child care workforce state matching grants program and fund administered by the early childhood Iowa state board to award matching state grants to eligible communities and making an appropriation.(Formerly HF 6.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act establishing a child care workforce state matching grants program and fund administered by the early childhood Iowa state board to award matching state grants to eligible communities and making an appropriation.(Formerly HF 6.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
2021-03-23SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 668.
2021-02-23SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-02-19SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2021 11:00AM RM 24A.
2021-02-17SenateSubcommittee: Green, Lofgren, and Mathis. S.J. 391.
2021-02-11SenateRead first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 320.
2021-02-11SenateMessage from House. S.J. 320.
2021-02-10HouseImmediate message. H.J. 368.
2021-02-11HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 382.
2021-02-10HousePassed House, yeas 92, nays 2. H.J. 348.
2021-02-02HouseRereferred to calendar. H.J. 281.
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 243.

Same As/Similar To

HF6 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback