IA HF598 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the assignment of pupils who are siblings to classrooms by school districts. (Formerly HF 197.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the assignment of pupils who are siblings to classrooms by school districts. (Formerly HF 197.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-16 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 862. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 969. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 5. S.J. 968. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 849. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Giddens, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 728. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 669. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 669. |
2019-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 582. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 91, nays 5. H.J. 575. |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment H-1032 adopted, as amended. H.J. 574. |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment H-1042 to H-1032 adopted. H.J. 574. |
2019-03-18 | House | Amendment H-1042 filed. H.J. 566. |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment H-1032 filed. H.J. 563. |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 389. |
Same As/Similar To
HF197 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.