IA HF597 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Celsi, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 591.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Celsi, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 591.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including modifying provisions related to school district library programs and the educational program provided to students enrolled in school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and charter schools.(Formerly HSB 219.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including modifying provisions related to school district library programs and the educational program provided to students enrolled in school districts, accredited nonpublic schools, and charter schools.(Formerly HSB 219.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Celsi, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 591. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 545. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 545. |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 559. |
2023-03-08 | House | Passed House, yeas 60, nays 37. H.J. 558. |
2023-03-08 | House | Amendments H-1040 and H-1041 withdrawn. H.J. 558. |
2023-03-02 | House | Amendments H-1040 and H-1041 filed. H.J. 490. |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 484. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB219 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 597.