IA HF597 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the distribution and sale of motor fuel, including blended and unblended gasoline and diesel fuel, providing for liability, and including penalties. (Formerly HF 376) (See Cmte. Bill HF 640)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the distribution and sale of motor fuel, including blended and unblended gasoline and diesel fuel, providing for liability, and including penalties. (Formerly HF 376) (See Cmte. Bill HF 640)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-05-02 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1003. |
2013-04-09 | House | Subcommittee, Hein, Kelley, and Windschitl. H.J. 812. |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 685. |
2013-03-25 | House | Amendment H-1211 filed. H.J. 671. |
2013-03-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 559. |