IA HF568 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1009.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1009.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pari-mutuel wagering, including horse and dog racing medication requirements and the applicability of certain setoff procedures to advance deposit wagering operators and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 137.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 1 and 2 effective 4-13-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pari-mutuel wagering, including horse and dog racing medication requirements and the applicability of certain setoff procedures to advance deposit wagering operators and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 137.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 1 and 2 effective 4-13-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1009. |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 897. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 901. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 900. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 802. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 594. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 594. |
2017-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 644. |
2017-03-14 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-14 | House | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 0. H.J. 639. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 556. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1106 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Schultz, and Danielson.
HSB137 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 495.
HSB137 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 495.