IA HF558 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the office of the chief information officer relating to designation of certain information technology staff, background checks, and the technology advisory council. (Formerly HSB 119)(See HF 637.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning the office of the chief information officer relating to designation of certain information technology staff, background checks, and the technology advisory council. (Formerly HSB 119)(See HF 637.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1074. |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 982. |
2017-03-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-03-22 | House | Subcommittee: Landon, Sexton and Thede. H.J. 756. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 554. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB119 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 491.
SSB1105 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Chapman, and Bowman.
HF637 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 801.
SSB1105 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Chapman, and Bowman.
HF637 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 801.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF558 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF558.html |