IA HF548 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to court records for residential forcible entry and detainer actions and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 43.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to court records for residential forcible entry and detainer actions and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 43.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/28/2023 11:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Quirmbach, and Reichman. S.J. 697. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 694. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 694. |
2023-03-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 725. |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 712. |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment H-1144 adopted. H.J. 712. |
2023-03-21 | House | Amendment H-1144 filed. H.J. 709. |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 476. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB43 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 548.
SSB1118 (Related) 2023-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
SSB1118 (Related) 2023-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].