IA HF536 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act concerning penalties relating to drug paraphernalia and certain traffic offenses, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HF 301.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act concerning penalties relating to drug paraphernalia and certain traffic offenses, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HF 301.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20SenateFiscal note.
2023-03-15SenateSubcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Zaun. S.J. 591.
2023-03-14SenateReferred to Judiciary. S.J. 570.
2023-03-13SenateRead first time, passed on file. S.J. 552.
2023-03-13SenateMessage from House. S.J. 552.
2023-03-09HouseImmediate message. H.J. 596.
2023-03-09HousePassed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 592.
2023-03-09HouseAmendment H-1072 adopted. H.J. 592.
2023-03-08HouseFiscal note.
2023-03-08HouseAmendment H-1072 filed. H.J. 562.
2023-03-01HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 454.

Same As/Similar To

HF301 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 596.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback