IA HF523 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act designating certain county flood mitigation activities as an essential county purpose. (Formerly HSB 56.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act designating certain county flood mitigation activities as an essential county purpose. (Formerly HSB 56.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1099. |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1098. |
2021-04-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1022. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 980. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 979. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for SF 607. S.J. 978. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 896. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/07/2021 8:30AM RM 111. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Goodwin, and T. Taylor. S.J. 767. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 721. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2021 1:00PM RM 111. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Klimesh, and J. Smith. S.J. 604. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 572. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 572. |
2021-03-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 661. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 698. |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays none. H.J. 659. |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 391. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB56 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 386.