IA HF517 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the implementation of federal statute, regulation, or policy by state administrative agencies. (Formerly HF 65)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the implementation of federal statute, regulation, or policy by state administrative agencies. (Formerly HF 65)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-05 | House | Referred to Economic Growth. H.J. 760. |
2013-03-18 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2013-03-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 492. |